Accounts and annual returns CODSALL FORGET-ME-NOT CLUB

Charity number: 217515
Charity reporting is overdue by 175 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 175 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 175 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 14 November 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 11 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 09 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 06 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required