ST. SWITHIN'S CHURCH LANDS TRUST

Charity number: 217585
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 19 January 2021 80 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 12 November 2019 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 01 November 2018 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 23 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required