ST. SWITHIN'S CHURCH LANDS TRUST

Charity number: 217585
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.41k £6.02k £1.60k £1.64k £1.52k
Total expenditure £0 £592 £300 £3.00k £4.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A