Trustees ST. SWITHIN'S CHURCH LANDS TRUST

Charity number: 217585
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

22 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev James Prestwood Chair 23 July 2014
ST SWITHIN'S COMMUNITY CENTRE
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF LINCOLN ST SWITHIN
Received: On time
THE SALTHOUSE (LINCOLN)
Recently registered
Rev Benjamin Jonathan Willis Trustee 05 July 2022
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF LINCOLN ST SWITHIN
Received: On time
Rev Juliette Sophie Willis Trustee 05 July 2022
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF LINCOLN ST SWITHIN
Received: On time
Rosemary Anne Brooks Trustee 09 May 2022
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF LINCOLN ST SWITHIN
Received: On time
Joanna Grace Epton Trustee 09 May 2022
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF LINCOLN ST SWITHIN
Received: On time
Kathryn Lydia Marsden Trustee 24 April 2022
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF LINCOLN ST SWITHIN
Received: On time
Hayley Nadine Palmer Trustee 24 April 2022
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF LINCOLN ST SWITHIN
Received: On time
Rev Benjamin Eric Brady Trustee 13 June 2021
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF LINCOLN ST SWITHIN
Received: On time
Callum William Roper Trustee 26 April 2021
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF LINCOLN ST SWITHIN
Received: On time
Rebecca Anne Bull Trustee 26 April 2021
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF LINCOLN ST SWITHIN
Received: On time
David Paul Stapleton Trustee 26 April 2021
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF LINCOLN ST SWITHIN
Received: On time
Jane Louise Pickersgill Trustee 25 April 2021
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF LINCOLN ST SWITHIN
Received: On time
Paul Finch Trustee 18 October 2020
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF LINCOLN ST SWITHIN
Received: On time
John Crowder Trustee 18 October 2020
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF LINCOLN ST SWITHIN
Received: On time
Moji Wadsworth Trustee 18 October 2020
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF LINCOLN ST SWITHIN
Received: On time
Daniel Robert Chard Trustee 28 April 2019
ST SWITHIN'S COMMUNITY CENTRE
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF LINCOLN ST SWITHIN
Received: On time
Mark Perry Trustee 28 April 2019
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF LINCOLN ST SWITHIN
Received: On time
Linzi Crowder Trustee 28 April 2019
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF LINCOLN ST SWITHIN
Received: On time
Dr Phil Williams Trustee 30 April 2018
None on record
Susan Barbara Elizabeth Watt Trustee 30 April 2018
None on record
Richard John Lambert Trustee 01 May 2016
None on record
RACHEL CAROL TYRRELL Trustee 24 March 2016
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF LINCOLN ST SWITHIN
Received: On time