Financial history PARISH HALL FUND

Charity number: 217593
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £2.79k £2.85k £2.93k £3.01k £3.11k
Total expenditure £2.74k £4.14k £3.34k £2.75k £3.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A