Financial history MOUNTSORREL RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY

Charity number: 217615
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £149.63k £153.00k £153.76k £229.85k £224.55k
Total expenditure £156.98k £208.45k £245.91k £140.92k £149.35k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A