Trustees MOUNTSORREL RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY

Charity number: 217615
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
George Overton Chair 14 April 2020
MOUNTSORREL UNITED CHARITIES
Received: On time
MEGAN PIRT Trustee 16 March 2022
MOUNTSORREL UNITED CHARITIES
Received: On time
MOUNTSORREL EDUCATIONAL FUND
Received: On time
THE CASTLEDINE ALMSHOUSES
Received: On time
Alan John Brown Trustee 09 June 2021
MOUNTSORREL UNITED CHARITIES
Received: On time
Rachel Helen White Trustee 10 March 2021
MOUNTSORREL UNITED CHARITIES
Received: On time
Elizabeth Mary Blackshaw Trustee 09 December 2020
MOUNTSORREL UNITED CHARITIES
Received: On time
Paul Albert Harris Trustee 14 April 2020
MOUNTSORREL UNITED CHARITIES
Received: On time
MOUNTSORREL WAR MEMORIALS TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
Frederick Lewis Newitt Trustee 14 April 2020
MOUNTSORREL UNITED CHARITIES
Received: On time
Geoffrey Wainwright Trustee 14 April 2020
MOUNTSORREL UNITED CHARITIES
Received: On time
LOUGHBOROUGH METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Penelope Jane Maguire Trustee 14 April 2020
MOUNTSORREL UNITED CHARITIES
Received: On time
Benjamin Evan Davies Trustee 14 April 2020
MOUNTSORREL UNITED CHARITIES
Received: On time
Roger Verdun Carroll Trustee 14 April 2020
MOUNTSORREL UNITED CHARITIES
Received: On time
Christopher William Berry Trustee 14 April 2020
MOUNTSORREL UNITED CHARITIES
Received: On time
Jayne Elizabeth Ilett Trustee 14 April 2020
MOUNTSORREL UNITED CHARITIES
Received: On time
Rev Colin Ernst Resch Trustee 14 April 2020
MOUNTSORREL UNITED CHARITIES
Received: On time
MOUNTSORREL EDUCATIONAL FUND
Received: On time