THOMAS ROCH

Charity number: 217743
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 19 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 10 March 2020 131 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 15 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 14 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required