LLANFIHANGEL RHYDITHON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 12 May 1975: Standard registration
- 09 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 12 MAY 1975
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POOR PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE COMMUNITY OF LLANFIHANGEL RHYDITHON EITHER IN GIFTS OF KIND OR GRANTS OF MONEY: PROVIDED THAT INCOME SHALL NOT BE APPLIED DIRECTLY IN RELIEF OF RATES, TAXES OR OTHER PUBLIC FUNDS.
Area of benefit
COMMUNITY OF LLANFIHANGEL RHYDITHON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window