Accounts and annual returns REES JEFFREYS ROAD FUND

Charity number: 217771
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 03 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 03 June 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 10 February 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 18 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 18 February 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 15 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 15 February 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 15 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 15 February 2018 On time Download Open in new window