Financial history REES JEFFREYS ROAD FUND

Charity number: 217771
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £106.32k £81.62k £72.29k £152.38k £520.74k
Total expenditure £276.04k £308.83k £245.12k £202.32k £372.30k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £350.00k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £170.74k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £327.64k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £44.66k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £59.85k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £178.99k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0