Financial history SECULAR CLERGY NEW COMMON FUND

Charity number: 217776
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £59.69k £52.60k £65.62k £59.73k £55.98k
Total expenditure £87.85k £92.56k £91.39k £93.94k £95.36k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A