FISHGUARD SENIOR CITIZENS' WELFARE COMMITTEE

Charity number: 217795
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2020 17 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2019 17 October 2020 322 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2018 03 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2017 08 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2016 07 January 2017 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2016 Not Required