Accounts and annual returns BREWOOD OLD PEOPLE'S WELFARE COMMITTEE

Charity number: 217885
Charity reporting is overdue by 1577 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 116 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 116 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 481 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 481 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 846 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 846 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1211 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1211 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1577 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1577 days