Financial history BREWOOD OLD PEOPLE'S WELFARE COMMITTEE

Charity number: 217885
Charity reporting is overdue by 1578 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012
Total gross income £1.39k £489 £786 £469 £761
Total expenditure £1.07k £1.18k £1.24k £1.22k £1.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A