LYNEHAM CHURCH HALL

Charity number: 217899
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £8.38k £21.58k £21.85k £8.54k £6.53k
Total expenditure £8.13k £17.65k £17.67k £8.11k £7.69k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A