LLANDRINIO VILLAGE INSTITUTE

Charity number: 218156
Charity reporting is overdue by 111 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/11/2015 30/11/2016 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019
Total gross income £19.50k £14.95k £19.48k £21.91k £13.33k
Total expenditure £18.67k £19.69k £19.59k £21.89k £19.79k
Income from government contracts £0 £1.93k £2.94k £1.23k £2.27k
Income from government grants £4.20k £250 £5.20k £9.00k N/A