Accounts and annual returns LEONARD CHESHIRE DISABILITY

Charity number: 218186
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 27 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 27 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 01 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 01 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 22 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 22 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 20 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 20 September 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 04 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 04 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window