Financial history LEONARD CHESHIRE DISABILITY

Charity number: 218186
Charity reporting is up to date (59 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £175.90m £162.02m £151.63m £153.81m £158.45m
Total expenditure £171.53m £167.67m £166.33m £161.54m £163.29m
Income from government contracts £126.71m £142.14m £133.30m £131.29m £133.56m
Income from government grants £43.50k N/A N/A N/A £4.73m
Income - Donations and legacies £25.14m £14.87m £9.01m £7.33m £7.61m
Income - Other trading activities £451.00k £483.00k £608.00k £139.00k £135.00k
Income - Charitable activities £149.28m £145.18m £140.48m £141.13m £145.67m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £3.45m £0
Income - Investment £358.00k £344.00k £237.00k £151.00k £135.00k
Income - Other £662.00k £1.15m £1.30m £5.06m £4.89m
Income - Legacies £21.36m £7.45m £3.75m £3.89m £6.28m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £167.45m £164.30m £157.47m £157.73m £159.32m
Expenditure - Raising funds £4.08m £3.36m £3.33m £3.64m £3.29m
Expenditure - Governance £447.00k £381.00k £487.00k £530.00k £546.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £14.72m £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £5.53m £159.00k £674.00k