LEONARD CHESHIRE DISABILITY

Charity number: 218186
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Anne Goodman Trustee 21 July 2021 None on record
Philip Cassidy Trustee 24 September 2019 None on record
Dr Sylvia Josephine Anie Trustee 21 March 2018 None on record
Adam Wiltshire Trustee 21 July 2021 None on record
Gareth Davies Trustee 25 March 2021 None on record
VIDAR HJARDENG Trustee 04 January 2017
B:MUSIC LTD Received: On time
Dr STEPHEN CHARLES DUCKWORTH OBE Trustee 21 March 2018
RFU INJURED PLAYERS FOUNDATION Received: On time
GURSHARAN KAUR Trustee 29 November 2018 None on record
David Richard Pugh Trustee 21 March 2018 None on record
Ranald Mair Trustee 26 October 2016 None on record
David Grayson Chair 17 December 2020 None on record
DR COLIN HUNTER OBE FRCGP Trustee 29 November 2016 None on record
HILARY SEARS Trustee 27 September 2018 None on record