NORTH LUFFENHAM VILLAGE TRUST

Charity number: 218214
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 30 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 30 June 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 19 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 19 May 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 15 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 15 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 11 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 11 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 06 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 06 June 2017 On time Download