Financial history NORTH LUFFENHAM VILLAGE TRUST

Charity number: 218214
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022
Total gross income £58.78k £59.11k £63.15k £64.39k £67.05k
Total expenditure £61.76k £58.56k £53.03k £42.28k £43.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A