LANCASTRIAN LODGE NO 2528 BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 218396
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 25 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 15 August 2020 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 04 January 2020 158 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 23 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 02 October 2017 64 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required