ELFORD RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY

Charity number: 218468
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £38 £41 £42 £43 £43
Total expenditure £0 £0 £50 £67 £103
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A