Financial history THE HEREFORD CATHEDRAL ALMSHOUSE CHARITY OF SAINT KATHERINE AND SAINT ETHELBERT

Charity number: 218575
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £249.42k £286.76k £211.86k £174.87k £253.34k
Total expenditure £332.08k £307.17k £157.54k £377.56k £586.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A