SUTTON COLDFIELD CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 218627
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £1.81m £1.92m £1.98m £2.11m £1.91m
Total expenditure £1.90m £1.88m £2.14m £1.95m £1.94m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £566 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £190.82k £204.61k £196.22k £195.21k £202.52k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.61m £1.72m £1.78m £1.91m £1.71m
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £566 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.70m £1.70m £1.95m £1.70m £1.77m
Expenditure - Raising funds £197.02k £188.15k £191.31k £246.55k £171.82k
Expenditure - Governance £96.03k £98.99k £116.43k £150.89k £175.98k
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.08m £1.20m £1.26m £1.06m £1.15m
Expenditure - Investment management £197.02k £188.15k £129.46k £155.46k £104.58k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0