SUTTON COLDFIELD CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 218627
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MALCOLM IVOR CORNISH Trustee None on record
INGE KETTNER Trustee 05 August 2015 None on record
Jayne Paula Luckett Trustee 13 May 2020 None on record
Diane Donaldson Trustee 08 November 2017
BIRMINGHAM BODENHAM TRUST Overdue by 132 days
FOUNDATION FOR CONDUCTIVE EDUCATION Received: On time
THE BIRMINGHAM INTERNATIONAL AIRPORT COMMUNITY TRUST FUND
CLARA MARTINEAU CHARITY Received: On time
THE LORD MAYOR OF BIRMINGHAM'S CHARITY Received: On time
Andrew Charles Morris Trustee 11 February 2015 None on record
ANDREW FRANCIS BURLEY Chair 16 January 2014 None on record
KEITH MATTHEW DUDLEY Trustee 07 May 2014
THE LORD AUSTIN TRUST Received: On time
FOUNDATION FOR CONDUCTIVE EDUCATION Received: On time
SUTTON COLDFIELD GRAMMAR SCHOOL FOR GIRLS CHARITY Received: On time
Cllr Jane Mosson Trustee 23 June 2020 None on record
RANJAN HOATH Trustee 03 May 2017 None on record
Dr Francis Patrick Murray Trustee 07 November 2018 None on record
Cllr. Simon Douglas John Ward Trustee 10 June 2020 None on record
Rev William John Routh Trustee 08 November 2017
THE BIRMINGHAM DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY TRINITY SUTTON COLDFIELD Received: On time
ANTHONY NEIL ANDREWS Trustee
THE LORD AUSTIN TRUST Received: On time
Dr STEPHEN CHARLES MARTIN Trustee None on record