WARWICK DISTRICT CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2005
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 19 January 1965: Standard registration
- 06 November 2006: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- WARWICK DISTRICT C A B (Working name)
- THE WARWICK DISTRICT CITIZENS' ADVICE BUREAU (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £249.82k | £245.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £254.02k | £238.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 23 January 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 23 January 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 10 December 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 10 December 2004 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30 APRIL 1974 AND AMENDED 30 SEPTEMBER 2003.
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSE OF BENEFITTING THE COMMUNITY IN THE AREA OF THE WARWICK DISTRICT COUNCIL (A) BY ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS RELATING TO MENTA, PHYSICAL AND SOCIAL WELFARE (B) BY RELIEVING POVERTY. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 2 OF ABOVE CONSTITUTION).
Area of benefit
AREA OF WARWICK DISTRICT COUNCIL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window