HEREFORD MUNICIPAL CHARITIES

Charity number: 218738
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 29 June 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 05 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 16 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 14 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 16 December 2019 46 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 15 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 06 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 13 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 03 July 2017 On time Download