HEREFORD MUNICIPAL CHARITIES

Charity number: 218738
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £363.93k £383.73k £403.65k £407.54k £425.67k
Total expenditure £241.44k £359.82k £336.49k £294.68k £207.40k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A