BAPTIST BUILDING FUND

Charity number: 218823
Charity reporting is up to date (13 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 13 November 2020 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 13 November 2020 13 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 04 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 04 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 12 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 12 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 27 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 27 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 04 June 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 08 June 2016 On time Download