BAPTIST BUILDING FUND

Charity number: 218823
Charity reporting is up to date (13 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev MARTIN ROBERT POOLE BD Trustee
BALLARD SCHOOL LIMITED Received: On time
Rev IAN JOHN BUNCE Trustee 15 November 2017
ROMFORD BAPTIST CHURCH Received: On time
BAPTIST BUILDING CIO Recently registered
JOHN DAVID LEVICK DIPFS ACIB Trustee
HINCHLEY CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
CASTLE HILL BAPTIST CHURCH WARWICK Received: On time
THE BAPTIST UNION OF GREAT BRITAIN Received: On time
RETIRED BAPTIST MINISTERS HOUSING ORGANISATION Received: On time
THE TIMIOS TRUST Received: On time
David Leverett FCA Trustee
TIMSON FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST Overdue by 96 days
BAPTIST BUILDING CIO Recently registered
D M L 73 TRUST Received: On time
FULLER BAPTIST CHURCH, KETTERING Received: On time
Philip Jones Trustee 15 November 2017
BAPTIST BUILDING CIO Recently registered
Michael Smedley Trustee 15 November 2017
BAPTIST BUILDING CIO Recently registered
FARINGDON BAPTIST CHURCH Received: On time
Andrew Colin Burgess Chair 27 July 2011
BAPTIST BUILDING CIO Recently registered
OUNDLE BAPTIST CHURCH Received: On time
John Walker LLB DLP Trustee 26 June 2019
BAPTIST BUILDING CIO Recently registered
ANDREW MEIRION LEWIS BSC FRICS Trustee
BAPTIST BUILDING CIO Recently registered
Eric Cousins Trustee 01 July 2015
BAPTIST BUILDING CIO Recently registered
Rev Catriona Julie Mae Gorton BA BSc Trustee 09 July 2014
BAPTIST BUILDING CIO Recently registered
Dr Robert Alan Wordsworth PhD BSc Trustee 15 November 2017
BAPTIST BUILDING CIO Recently registered