THE OAKDALE TRUST

Charity number: 218827
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £353.44k £431.31k £977.98k £367.16k £315.98k
Total expenditure £311.23k £303.64k £399.24k £390.90k £264.24k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A £977.98k N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £308.29k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £90.95k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £2.54k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £305.75k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £90.95k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A