LADY MARY TOWNSHEND

Charity number: 218880
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Gillian Rose Foortse Trustee 23 August 2017
THE GOGGS RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY Received: On time
HARRISON EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
THE FAKENHAM RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY Received: On time
Daniel Andrews Chair 09 July 2019
THE GOGGS RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY Received: On time
HARRISON EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
THE FAKENHAM RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY Received: On time
Richard Lynam Trustee 13 July 2021
THE GOGGS RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY Received: On time
HARRISON EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER AND ST PAUL, FAKENHAM Received: On time
THE FAKENHAM RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY Received: On time
Adam Russell Bunkle Trustee 13 October 2020
HARRISON EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
THE FAKENHAM RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY Received: On time
RICHARD MANSEUR Received: On time
Adrian Robin Vertigan Trustee 23 September 2017
THE GOGGS RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY Received: On time
HARRISON EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
THE FAKENHAM RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY Received: On time