THE HOSPITAL OF ST JOHN THE EVANGELIST AND OF ST ANNE IN OKEHAM

Charity number: 218931
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 06 April 2021 24 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2021 24 August 2021 On time Download
Annual return 06 April 2020 11 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2020 11 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 06 April 2019 06 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2019 06 August 2019 On time Download
Annual return 06 April 2018 25 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2018 25 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 06 April 2017 26 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2017 26 September 2017 On time Download