THE HOSPITAL OF ST JOHN THE EVANGELIST AND OF ST ANNE IN OKEHAM

Charity number: 218931
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 06/04/2017 06/04/2018 06/04/2019 06/04/2020 06/04/2021
Total gross income £747.24k £732.49k £756.26k £805.13k £797.25k
Total expenditure £675.00k £696.32k £708.22k £766.20k £727.04k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £22.50k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.10k £280 £325 £5.24k £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £620.03k £601.82k £622.48k £660.80k £656.18k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £122.66k £126.87k £129.56k £136.02k £115.02k
Income - Other £3.44k £3.52k £3.89k £3.07k £26.05k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £654.57k £674.67k £686.71k £744.26k £703.95k
Expenditure - Raising funds £20.42k £21.65k £21.51k £21.94k £23.08k
Expenditure - Governance £23.08k £23.22k £23.35k £22.75k £21.70k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £20.42k £21.65k £21.51k £21.94k £23.08k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0