PAROCHIAL CHARITIES

Charity number: 218981
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 17 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 31 March 2021 151 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 06 March 2020 127 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 11 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 24 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required