BMA CHARITIES TRUST FUND

Charity number: 219102
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £309.03k £297.60k £554.72k £290.38k £321.98k
Total expenditure £260.79k £355.83k £402.89k £342.90k £311.12k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £396.54k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A £157.18k N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A £1.00k N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £240.00k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £402.33k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £569 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £21.28k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £5.00k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A