BMA CHARITIES TRUST FUND

Charity number: 219102
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Rajiv Wijesuriya Trustee 18 November 2021
THE DAIN FUND Received: On time
Dr ANDREW JOHN MOWAT Chair 08 November 2011
THE DAIN FUND Received: On time
Dr ANDREW RICHARD DEARDEN Trustee 08 November 2011 None on record
Thomas Peter Grinyer Trustee 22 July 2019
BMA FOUNDATION Recently registered
Dr Mary Jane Platt Trustee 18 November 2021
THE DAIN FUND Received: On time
NORFOLK DEAF ASSOCIATION (NDA) Received: On time
Heather Elaine Byron Trustee 20 December 2018 None on record
Dr Gavin Robert Duthie Ralston Trustee 21 May 2020 None on record
Dr Trevor Paul Pickersgill Trustee 15 October 2019 None on record
Dr Latifa Patel Trustee 08 July 2021 None on record