ESTATE CHARITY OF EDWARD HALL

Charity number: 219120
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2020 10 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2019 09 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2018 12 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2017 18 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2016 19 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2016 Not Required