Accounts and annual returns CHARITY OF ALBERT OF FLOWERDEW

Charity number: 219156
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2021 30 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2020 20 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2019 25 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2018 25 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2017 10 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2017 Not Required