BELGRADE THEATRE TRUST (COVENTRY) LIMITED

Charity number: 219163
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £6.00m £6.02m £5.76m £6.24m £7.12m
Total expenditure £5.98m £6.37m £6.11m £6.84m £6.47m
Income from government contracts £39.90k £33.80k £23.87k £16.00k N/A
Income from government grants £1.79m £1.61m £1.54m £1.54m £2.98m
Income - Donations and legacies £361.59k £18.35k £26.23k £1.70m £3.20m
Income - Other trading activities £2.90m £3.02m £2.99m £1.59m £1.22m
Income - Charitable activities £2.73m £2.98m £2.74m £2.94m £2.69m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £5.43k £4.81k £1.36k £5.10k £5.29k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £361.59k £18.35k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.30m £5.32m £5.04m £5.63m £5.44m
Expenditure - Raising funds £687.27k £1.04m £1.07m £1.21m £1.03m
Expenditure - Governance £13.78k £11.54k £13.02k £14.36k £13.07k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0