BELGRADE THEATRE TRUST (COVENTRY) LIMITED

Charity number: 219163
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Nathaniel Dodzo Trustee 15 February 2018 None on record
Councillor Roger Bailey Trustee 24 July 2019 None on record
Annette Hay Trustee 14 February 2019 None on record
MR HAMISH GLEN Trustee None on record
Alan Pollock Trustee 04 December 2013 None on record
Jonathan James Wilby Trustee 14 February 2019 None on record
STEWART FERGUSSON Chair 30 October 2012 None on record
Tony Skipper Trustee 20 May 2016 None on record
SHEILA ANNE BATES Trustee 14 September 2017
THE RICOH ARENA COMMUNITY SPACE Received: On time
Paul Carvell Trustee 05 June 2017 None on record
MS JOANNA REID Trustee None on record