Financial history THE GRIMSBY PASTURES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE ENROLLED FREEMEN OF GRIMSBY

Charity number: 219207
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022
Total gross income £461.90k £548.62k £559.60k £517.23k £537.00k
Total expenditure £469.87k £573.42k £715.64k £602.60k £555.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £53.39k £2.94k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £250.62k £253.30k £268.30k £289.01k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £298.00k £306.30k £248.93k £247.99k
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £400.41k £428.89k £387.00k £407.77k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £133.94k £252.07k £197.95k £145.98k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £35.21k £29.46k £29.04k £23.87k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £133.94k £252.07k £197.95k £145.98k
Expenditure - Other N/A £39.07k £34.67k £17.65k £1.29k