Trustees THE GRIMSBY PASTURES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE ENROLLED FREEMEN OF GRIMSBY
Charity number: 219207

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SARA JAYNE Morris | Chair | 19 October 2010 |
|
|
||||
Alison Klug | Trustee | 06 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Louis Meller | Trustee | 15 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Marie Louise Fitzgerald | Trustee | 15 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tony Martin North | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
JAMES ROBERT STEER | Trustee | 04 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT EDWARD CULLUM | Trustee | 20 July 2010 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD ANTHONY BELLAMY | Trustee | 04 June 2007 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Paul White | Trustee | 04 June 1984 |
|
|||||
STEPHEN THOMAS WAKEFIELD | Trustee | 07 June 1983 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.