Dogfen lywodraethu PRISON ADVICE AND CARE TRUST (PACT)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1/9/1939 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS OF 11/10/1965 AND 5/7/1966 AND A CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION DATED 20/7/1973, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 18/4/2000 as amended on 17 May 2023 as amended on 17 May 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1. TO PROVIDE ADVICE, INFORMATION AND SUPPORT TO PEOPLE WHO ARE SUFFERING OR WHO HAVE SUFFERED A LEGAL RESTRICTION ON THEIR LIBERTY IN ANY PENAL OR CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION. 2. TO PROVIDE ADVICE, INFORMATION AND SUPPORT TO FAMILIES AND CHILDREN OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SUFFERING OR WHO HAVE SUFFERED A LEGAL RESTRICTION ON THEIR LIBERTY IN ANY PENAL OR CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION. 3. TO WORK FOR THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS AND ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING FOR OFFENDERS, EX-OFFENDERS, THEIR FAMILIES AND CHILDREN.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.