THE ROYAL BRITISH LEGION

Charity number: 219279
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £151.26m £159.17m £163.18m £175.88m £143.11m
Total expenditure £146.86m £155.29m £165.29m £181.68m £160.97m
Income from government contracts £0 £4.88m £5.15m N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.20m £10.13m £10.19m £16.03m £3.71m
Income - Donations and legacies £94.08m £92.73m £96.57m £101.32m £87.12m
Income - Other trading activities £23.28m £24.13m £23.54m £22.94m £18.85m
Income - Charitable activities £26.78m £35.76m £36.45m £44.62m £31.56m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £5.20m £5.97m £6.15m £6.62m £5.51m
Income - Other £1.92m £578.00k £474.00k £391.00k £69.00k
Income - Legacies £20.31m £21.65m £22.64m £21.79m £19.66m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £108.81m £115.92m £123.57m £138.19m £122.78m
Expenditure - Raising funds £38.05m £39.37m £41.73m £43.49m £38.20m
Expenditure - Governance £1.40m £988.00k £1.44m £1.09m £1.40m
Expenditure - Grants institution £10.49m £13.33m £9.50m £12.21m £5.33m
Expenditure - Investment management £44.00k £343.00k £348.00k £449.00k £404.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 -£1.00k £0 £0 £0