THE ROYAL BRITISH LEGION

Charity number: 219279
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
  • 10 July 1977: Standard registration
  • 05 November 2014: Funds received from 1093520 THE JOHN NICKOLS FOUNDATION
  • 06 August 2015: Funds received from 1051545 THE SAMSUNG ROYAL BRITISH LEGION, BRITISH KOREAN V...
  • 03 December 2018: Funds received from 1150833 THE DOUGLAS HAIG FELLOWSHIP
  • 29 October 2019: Funds received from 1119009 THE CREULLY CLUB MEMORIAL FUND
  • 22 July 2020: Funds received from 327829 THE JUNE STEVENS FOUNDATION
  • 14 May 2021: Funds received from 1003538 THE RAYMOND COLMAN CHARITABLE TRUST
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • POPPY APPEAL (Working name)
  • THE LEGION (Working name)
  • BRITISH LEGION (Previous name)
  • THE ROYAL BRITISH LEGION (CORPORATE BODY) (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Care Quality Commission
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property