THE KNIGHT CHARITY

Charity number: 219332
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2020 10 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2019 02 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2018 19 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2017 04 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2016 20 August 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2016 Not Required