CITY HOSPITAL NHS TRUST

Charity number: 219348
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £15.05k £16.55k £15.71k £10.45k £12.78k
Total expenditure £12.67k £21.71k £10.36k £7.79k £17.86k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A